This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 00:51:38 (UTC).

34th Hotel Ventures LLC v. AON RISK SOLUTIONS et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 34th Hotel Ventures LLC filed an Other lawsuit against AON RISK SOLUTIONS. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel M Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joel M Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

34th Hotel Ventures LLC

Defendants

AON RISK SOLUTIONS

AON RISK SERVICES NORTHEAST, INC.

RISK MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES INC. a/k/a RISK MANAGEMENT INTERNATIONAL LTD.

AON COMMERCIAL RISK SOLUTIONS as successors in interest to AON RISK SOLUTIONS

RISK MANAGEMENT INTERNATIONAL LTD.

RISK MANAGEMENT INTERNATIONAL LTD., as successor in interest to RISK MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABOULAFIA, MATTHEW S

Attorney at ABOULAFIA LAW FIRM, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

SEKEL, ANNE B

Attorney at FOLEY AND LARDNER LLP

JAYNE, MARCELLA M.

Attorney at Foley and Lardner

BROWN, ALLYSON NICOLE

Attorney at MIRANDA SLONE SKLARIN VERVENIOTIS LLP

MIRANDA, MICHAEL A

Attorney at MIRANDA SLONE SKLARIN VERVENIOTIS LLP

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

ANSWER Answer to RMI Cross-Claim and Affirmative Defenses

ANSWER Answer to RMI Cross-Claim and Affirmative Defenses; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jayne, M.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) Corrected Version of Aon's Memorandum of Law in Support

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) Corrected Version of Aon's Memorandum of Law in Support; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004); Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Certificate of Insurance

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Certificate of Insurance; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) in Support of Motion to Dismiss

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER

STIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AON; Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 01/03/2020; Received: 01/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to RMI Cross-Claim and Affirmative Defenses; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 12/24/2019; Received: 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Jayne, M.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) Corrected Version of Aon's Memorandum of Law in Support; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #004); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004); Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #004) Proof of Loss Breakdown; Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 12/16/2019; Received: 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Certificate of Insurance; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER; Filed By: Sekel, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AON; Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 03/14/2019; Received: 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Aboulafia, M.; Filed: 02/25/2019; Received: 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less