This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:28:22 (UTC).

345 UNDERHILL, L.L.C., v. CROSSFIT SYOSSET ACADEMY, LLC.,

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 345 UNDERHILL, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CROSSFIT SYOSSET ACADEMY, LLC . This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

345 UNDERHILL, L.L.C.,

Defendant

CROSSFIT SYOSSET ACADEMY, LLC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SOTTILE, THOMAS JOHN

Attorney at Mark L. Lubelsky and Associates

Lubelsky, Mark L.

Attorney at Mark L. Lubelsky and Associates

Defendant Attorney

FRANZELLA, GIUSEPPE

Attorney at LAZER, APTHEKER, ROSELLA & YEDID, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Franzella, G.; Filed: 09/21/2021; Received: 09/21/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 09/14/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sottile, T. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)

SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Sottile, T. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/17/2021; Received: 08/17/2021

AFFIDAVIT of mailing

AFFIDAVIT of mailing; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/17/2021; Received: 08/17/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/17/2021; Received: 08/17/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer; Filed By: Franzella, G.; Filed: 09/21/2021; Received: 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 09/14/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sottile, T. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED); Filed By: Sottile, T. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/25/2021; Received: 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/17/2021; Received: 08/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT of mailing; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/17/2021; Received: 08/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 08/17/2021; Received: 08/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Lubelsky, M. - filed by Gracia, C.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less