Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 02:51:13 (UTC).

225 Bennett Road Operating Company, LLC D/B/A Elderwood at Cheektowaga SNF v. Karen Hemmerling

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 225 Bennett Road Operating Company, LLC D/B/A Elderwood at Cheektowaga SNF filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Karen Hemmerling. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph Glownia. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph Glownia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

225 Bennett Road Operating Company, LLC D/B/A Elderwood at Cheektowaga SNF

Defendant

Karen Hemmerling

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PRZESPO, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

Attorney at Law Offices of Terry M. Sugrue & Associates, LLP

SUGRUE, TERRY MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TERRY M. SUGRUE & ASSOCIATES, LLP

Defendant Attorney

WASHINGTON, BOOKER T.

Attorney at Booker T. Washington, Attorney at Law

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action Karen Hemmerling

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action Karen Hemmerling; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Deed from Mr. Lewandowski to Mrs. Hemmerling

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Deed from Mr. Lewandowski to Mrs. Hemmerling; Filed By: Washington, B.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Reply Affidavit in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Reply Affidavit in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Washington, B.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Washington, B.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in support of cross motion

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in support of cross motion; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F Invoices

EXHIBIT(S) - F Invoices; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - E Deed; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Admission Application

EXHIBIT(S) - D Admission Application; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Skilled nursing facility advance beneficiaries

EXHIBIT(S) - C Skilled nursing facility advance beneficiaries; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Deed; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary R ... show more

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary R ... show more; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - A Deed; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint

COMPLAINT Verified Complaint; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action Karen Hemmerling; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Deed from Mr. Lewandowski to Mrs. Hemmerling; Filed By: Washington, B.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Reply Affidavit in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Washington, B.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation in Opposition to Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Washington, B.; Filed: 06/04/2020; Received: 06/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in support of cross motion; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Invoices; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Deed; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Admission Application; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Skilled nursing facility advance beneficiaries; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Medicare non coverage; Filed By: Sugrue, T.; Filed: 05/28/2020; Received: 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Deed; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Deed; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Verified Complaint; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Przespo, C.; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less