This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 11:15:01 (UTC).

21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. YVONNE L. CAESAR et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against YVONNE L CAESAR. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel J Doyle. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2688

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel J Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

21ST MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

PEARL CAPITAL RIVIS VENTURES, LLC

Yvonne L. Caesar

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

AUTOMOTIVE FINANCE CORPORATION DBA AFC AUTOMOTIVE FINANCE CORPORATION DBA AFC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

and, JOHN/JANE DOE 1 through JOHN/JANE DOE 10 (said last ten names being fictitious, it being the intention of plaintiff to designate any and all other tenants, occupants or other persons or entities having or claiming an interest in the real propert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CATALFIMO, MICHAEL J

Attorney at CARTER, CONBOY, CASE, BLACKMORE, MALONEY & LAIRD, P.C.

CATALFIMO, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at Rowlands, LeBrou & Griesmer, PLLC

Defendant Attorneys

WALLS, MICHELE M

Attorney at NYS OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

ROACH, MARY KEEFE

Attorney at OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorneys

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorneys; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry - Final Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry - Final Judgment; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Referee Report of Amount Due

REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Referee Report of Amount Due; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

OATH Referee Oath

OATH Referee Oath; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

BILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs

BILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorneys; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry - Final Judgment; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 02/12/2020; Received: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Referee Report of Amount Due; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH Referee Oath; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS Bill of Costs; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 Current Curriculum; Filed By: Catalfimo, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Exhibit G Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Catalfimo, M. - filed by Web Title Agency; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less