Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 18:30:41 (UTC).

161 HOLDING LTD v. ANA BANEGAS et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 161 HOLDING LTD filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANA BANEGAS. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is David B Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

David B Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

161 HOLDING LTD

Defendants

Ana Banegas

Ashley Bravo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NADELBACH, JOSHUA NEAL

Attorney at Borah, Goldstein, Altschuler, Nahins & Goidel, P.C.

ROSENBAUM, DAVID BARRY

Attorney at BORAH, GOLDSTEIN, ALTSCHULER, NAHINS & GOIDEL, P.C.

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of Notice of Entry with Decision

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of Notice of Entry with Decision; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry with Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry with Order; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)

ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of Complaint on Both Defendants

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of Complaint on Both Defendants; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of OSC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of OSC; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Summons 12N

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Summons 12N; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons & Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Lease; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deed; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Gary Gartenberg

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Gary Gartenberg; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation of David Rosenbaum

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation of David Rosenbaum; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) OSC seeking an Injunction

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) OSC seeking an Injunction; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of Notice of Entry with Decision; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry with Order; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 01/20/2020; Received: 01/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/17/2020; Received: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of Complaint on Both Defendants; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 12/04/2019; Received: 12/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Proof of Service of OSC; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2019; Received: 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/20/2019; Received: 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Summons 12N; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Lease; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deed; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Gary Gartenberg; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation of David Rosenbaum; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) OSC seeking an Injunction; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/19/2019; Received: 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Nadelbach, J.; Filed: 11/18/2019; Received: 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less