This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 18:56:43 (UTC).

1448 Bedford Funding L.P. - v. - 711 Park Pl Realty LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 1448 Bedford Funding L P filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against 711 Park Pl Realty LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is David B. Vaughan, Comm 9. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

David B. Vaughan, Comm 9

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1448 Bedford Funding L.P.

Defendants

711 Park Pl Realty LLC

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

New York City Department of Finance

Alfred Francis

Alexandra Meskin

Jack Perlamuter

Board of Directors of Byron Condominium Association, a/k/a 1448 Bedford Avenue Condominium Association Homeowners Association, Inc.

John Doe #1 through John Doe #12, the last twelve names being fictitious and unknown to Plaintiff, the persons or parties intended being the tenants, occupants, persons or corporations, if any, having or claiming an interest upon the premises describ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BONNEVILLE, MICHAEL JAMES

Attorney at Kriss and Feuerstein, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

WERTMAN, CHARLES

Attorney at Charles Wertman, Esq.

ARCHIBALD, ROGER V

Attorney at ROGER V. ARCHIBALD, ESQ. ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Order Granting permission to file the Notice of Sale with the Court

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Order Granting permission to file the Notice of Sale with the Court; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) Proposed Order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) Proposed Order; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Exhibit C- Order Granting Relief From Automatic Stay

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Exhibit C- Order Granting Relief From Automatic Stay; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Exhibit B- Notice of Bankruptcy Filing

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Exhibit B- Notice of Bankruptcy Filing; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A- Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A- Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 711 PARK PL REALTY LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 711 PARK PL REALTY LLC; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency with Schedule A Property Description

NOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency with Schedule A Property Description; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - UCC Financing Statement

EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - UCC Financing Statement; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Lien of Common Charges

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Lien of Common Charges; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Default letter

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Default letter; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Guarantee

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Guarantee; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Mortgage, Assignment of Leases and Rents and Security Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Mortgage, Assignment of Leases and Rents and Security Agreement; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Secured Promissory Note

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Secured Promissory Note; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint in A Foreclosure Action

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint in A Foreclosure Action; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry of Order Granting permission to file the Notice of Sale with the Court; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 05/08/2020; Received: 05/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/18/2020; Received: 03/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) Proposed Order; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Exhibit C- Order Granting Relief From Automatic Stay; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Exhibit B- Notice of Bankruptcy Filing; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A- Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - NYS Dept of Taxation & Finance; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 711 PARK PL REALTY LLC; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 08/07/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY Notice of Pendency with Schedule A Property Description; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - UCC Financing Statement; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Lien of Common Charges; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Default letter; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Guarantee; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Mortgage, Assignment of Leases and Rents and Security Agreement; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Secured Promissory Note; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint in A Foreclosure Action; Filed By: Bonneville, M.; Filed: 07/21/2017; Received: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less