This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 15:56:01 (UTC).

1424 Sheepshead Realty, Inc. - v. - 4800 Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 1424 Sheepshead Realty, Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 4800 Holdings LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1424 Sheepshead Realty, Inc.

Defendants

8800 Holdings LLC

4800 Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KRASLOW, RICHARD A

Attorney at RICHARD A KRASLOW PC

MULRY, KEVIN P

Attorney at FARRELL FRITZ, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

JAKOBY, ARTHUR G

Attorney at HERRICK FEINSTEIN LLP

IMPERATO, GERARD A.

Attorney at GERARD A IMPERATO

NEWMAN, JARED DAVID

Attorney at HERRICK, FEINSTEIN LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER by stipulation, dtd 12/18/19

ORDER - OTHER by stipulation, dtd 12/18/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #4)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #4); Filed By: Jakoby, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Exhibit D - Release of Easement

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Exhibit D - Release of Easement; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Exhibit C - Notice of Petition

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Exhibit C - Notice of Petition; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Exhibit B - Amended Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Exhibit B - Amended Complaint; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A - Depiction of Properties at Issue

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A - Depiction of Properties at Issue; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Affirmation of Kevin P. Mulry in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment

AFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Affirmation of Kevin P. Mulry in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #4) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #4) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #4)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #4); Filed By: Jakoby, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

NOTICE Letter Non-Consent to Efile/Other Filings to Efile

NOTICE Letter Non-Consent to Efile/Other Filings to Efile; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint - 8800 Holdings LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint - 8800 Holdings LLC; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint - 4800 Holdings LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint - 4800 Holdings LLC; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER by stipulation, dtd 12/18/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #4); Filed By: Jakoby, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Exhibit D - Release of Easement; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Exhibit C - Notice of Petition; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Exhibit B - Amended Complaint; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Exhibit A - Depiction of Properties at Issue; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Affirmation of Kevin P. Mulry in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #4) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Filed By: Mulry, K.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #4); Filed By: Jakoby, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #4) 4/26/19 Order; Filed By: Jakoby, A.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/25/2017; Received: 07/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Letter Non-Consent to Efile/Other Filings to Efile; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/26/2017; Received: 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint - 8800 Holdings LLC; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Summons and Complaint - 4800 Holdings LLC; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kraslow, R.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less