This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 05/04/2023 at 05:06:59 (UTC).

VanVoorhees, Paul E., As Trustee For VanVoorhees Family Trust vs. Fabian Electric, Inc. Melton, Randy, DBA Melton Electric Fabian Electric, Inc. vs. Evans Bancorp, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2014 VanVoorhees, Paul E , As Trustee For VanVoorhees Family Trust filed an Other lawsuit against Fabian Electric, Inc Melton, Randy, DBA Melton Electric Fabian Electric, Inc. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********4/NT

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul E. VanVoorhees

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

Fabian Electric, Inc.

Randy Melton

3Rd Party Defendant

Evans Bancorp, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Thomas Fusco-Gessick

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Matthew Philip Pynn

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

James Ryan White

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/29/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Control Date; Outcome Type: Dismissed; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Control Date; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Control Date; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 04:30 PM; Purpose: Control Date; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Compliance; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Default; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2017

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: Judgment; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Default Before Judge: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Conference: Status; Outcome Type: Settled Stip in File; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Status; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Settled Stip in File; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
04/10/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Status; Outcome Type: Removed from Calendar (no Control Date set); Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2015

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Control Date; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 05:00 PM; Purpose: Control Date; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Control Date; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2014

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less