This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 06/03/2021 at 06:40:09 (UTC).

Jamieson, Jason vs. Estate of Albert Morgan, Lisa Marie Coggins, as Executrix

Case Summary

On 10/28/2015 Jamieson, Jason filed an Other lawsuit against Estate of Albert Morgan, Lisa Marie Coggins, as Executrix. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********5/NT

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Jeffrey N. Mis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Jamieson

Defendant

Estate of Albert Morgan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J Gaffney

Defendant Attorney

Richard George Collins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/27/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Dismissal: 3216; Outcome Type: Dismissed; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Denied; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil; Motion Seq: 002

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2016

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: Judgment - Summary; Nature of Decision/Judge: Denied Before Judge: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Withdrawn - Index Disposed; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2016

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: Withdrawal as Attorney of Record; Nature of Decision/Judge: Withdrawn - Index Disposed Before Judge: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson

[+] Read More [-] Read Less