This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/25/2022 at 13:01:23 (UTC).

Williams, Angilica vs. Waldeck, Craig Orleans Estates, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 Williams, Angilica filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Waldeck, Craig Orleans Estates, LLC. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Luke A. Brown. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1/NT

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Luke A. Brown

 

Party Details

Claimant

Angilica Williams

Defendants

Craig Waldeck

Orleans Estates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ryan Patrick Hanna

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/15/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Settled; Judge Part: Honorable Luke A. Brown Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Luke A. Brown Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Reserved Decision; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2021

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Restore to Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Decision for All Plaintiffs Against All Defendants; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less