This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 10:35:45 (UTC).

Wade, Lucy vs. Collier, Evelyn "Doe", "John", AKA "Michael Marzo"

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Wade, Lucy filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Collier, Evelyn Doe , John , AKA Michael Marzo. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Cheryl J. Gonzales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Cheryl J. Gonzales

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lucy Wade

Respondents

"John" "Doe"

Evelyn Collier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Goldberg & Lindenberg, P.C.

Attorney at Goldberg & Lindenberg, P.C.

6 East 45Th Street 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Respondent Attorney

Domenick Napoletano

351 Court St

Brooklyn, NY 11231-4689

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable Cheryl J. Gonzales Part P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Cheryl J. Gonzales Part P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Cheryl J. Gonzales Part P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial Ready: Bench; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Cheryl J. Gonzales Part EX - Expediter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned Reserved Decision; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Submitted; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas Michael Fitzpatrick Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas Michael Fitzpatrick Part E; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Dismiss; Nature of Decision/Judge: Denied Before Judge: Honorable Zhuo Wang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less