This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/28/2019 at 13:54:14 (UTC).

Turner, Ronald M vs. Laurendi, Carmen J NVR, Inc., DBA Ryan Homes

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 Turner, Ronald M filed an Other lawsuit against Laurendi, Carmen J NVR, Inc , DBA Ryan Homes. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********8/LO

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald M Turner

Defendants

NVR, Inc.

Carmen J Laurendi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Robert Dipasquale

Defendant Attorney

Michael Reiser

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/13/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Removed from Calendar (no Control Date set); Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less