This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/19/2022 at 11:12:22 (UTC).

Turk, Daniel vs. Rodriguez, Shauniqua Doe, John Jane

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Turk, Daniel filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Rodriguez, Shauniqua Doe, John Jane. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable William J. Watson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2/LO

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable William J. Watson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daniel Turk

Respondents

Shauniqua Rodriguez

John Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nicholas J Narchus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/01/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Miscellaneous

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less