This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/26/2022 at 15:33:06 (UTC).

Turk, Daniel vs. Rodriguez, Shauniqua

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Turk, Daniel filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Rodriguez, Shauniqua. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1/LO

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daniel Turk

Respondent

Shauniqua Rodriguez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nicholas J Narchus

Respondent Attorney

Neighborhood Legal Services

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/01/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil; Motion Seq: 002

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2022

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Miscellaneous

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:45 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:45 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:45 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Warrant; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted Before Judge: Honorable William J. Watson

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, No Stay/Issuance Forthwith, Execution Stayed 14 days, Earliest Execution Date 12/17/2021; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less