This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 19:55:09 (UTC).

Tri-Block Associates vs. Plair, Michelle T. "Doe", "John" "Doe", "Jane" McCray, Darnell K.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Tri-Block Associates filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Plair, Michelle T Doe , John Doe , Jane McCray, Darnell K. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Zhuo Wang. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Zhuo Wang

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tri-Block Associates

Respondents

Darnell K. McCray

"John" "Doe"

Michelle T. Plair

"Jane" "Doe"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hertz, Cherson & Rosenthal, PC

Attorney at Hertz, Cherson & Rosenthal, PC

118-35 Queens Blvd, 9Th Floor

Forest Hills, NY 11375

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part R; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Zhuo Wang Part R; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Restore to Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Settled Stip in File; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial Ready: Bench; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Cheryl J. Gonzales Part EX - Expediter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Bruce E. Scheckowitz Part T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Bruce E. Scheckowitz Part T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less