This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/29/2022 at 00:38:43 (UTC).

Trammell, Theresa vs. Greiner, Philip Reitzs, Matthew Falletta, David, Owner Of Putting Around, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Trammell, Theresa filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Greiner, Philip Reitzs, Matthew Falletta, David, Owner Of Putting Around, LLC. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Katherine D. Alexander. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1/NT

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Katherine D. Alexander

 

Party Details

Claimant

Theresa Trammell

Defendants

Philip Greiner

Matthew Reitzs

David Falletta

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Reserved Decision; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less