This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 07/21/2022 at 17:57:38 (UTC).

TDA, LLC, Doing Business As Regional Heavy Equipment and Truck DBA Lacey Heavy Equipment and Truck vs. Beyer Jr., Peter W

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 TDA, LLC, Doing Business As Regional Heavy Equipment and Truck DBA Lacey Heavy Equipment and Truck filed an Other lawsuit against Beyer Jr , Peter W. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2/LO

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Claimant

TDA, LLC

Defendant

Peter W Beyer Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark D Grossman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/11/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Decision for All Plaintiffs Against All Defendants; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less