This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 12/29/2020 at 19:35:49 (UTC).

Steven Dangelo, PT, as assignee of Trude Flynn vs. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 Steven Dangelo, PT, as assignee of Trude Flynn filed an Other lawsuit against Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Bronx County Civil Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********7/BX

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Dangelo, PT

Defendant

Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcote & Associates, P.C.

Attorney at Marcote & Associates, P.C.

108 New South Road

Hicksville, NY 11801

Defendant Attorney

Law Offices Of Aloy O. Ibuzor

Attorney at Law Offices Of Aloy O. Ibuzor

485 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Judge Part: No Justice Recorded Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Bianka Perez Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:35 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Naita A. Semaj Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Withdrawn; Judge Part: Honorable Marissa Soto Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Withdrawn; Judge Part: Honorable Marissa Soto Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Naita A. Semaj Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Naita A. Semaj Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Lyle E. Frank Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Lyle E. Frank Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Lyle E. Frank Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Lyle E. Frank Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Compel; Nature of Decision/Judge: Withdrawn Before Judge: Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: Strike Answer; Nature of Decision/Judge: Withdrawn Before Judge: Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less