This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 12/09/2022 at 07:13:28 (UTC).

Sherman, Susan vs. Youngman, Christopher

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Sherman, Susan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Youngman, Christopher. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2/LO

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Claimant

Susan Sherman

Defendant

Christopher Youngman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/18/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Decision for All Plaintiffs Against All Defendants; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2022

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted Before Judge: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Decision for All Plaintiffs Against All Defendants; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:15 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less