This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/22/2020 at 08:09:16 (UTC).

RSR & AZ Lefferts, LLC Dutchmen & Wolverines, LLC, & RR RE Investors LLC, vs. Armstead, Edward Chapman, Samantha "Doe", "John" "Doe", "Jane"

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 RSR AZ Lefferts, LLC Dutchmen Wolverines, LLC, RR RE Investors LLC, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Armstead, Edward Chapman, Samantha Doe , John Doe , Jane. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Malikah Sherman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Malikah Sherman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RSR & AZ Lefferts, LLC Dutchmen & Wolverines, LLC, & RR RE Investors LLC,

Respondents

Edward Armstead

Samantha Chapman

"John" "Doe"

"Jane" "Doe"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

David Wayne Graber

55 Watermill Ln

Great Neck, NY 11021-4203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Malikah Sherman Part J; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Malikah Sherman Part J; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part J; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part J; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable David Alan Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, No Stay/Issuance Forthwith, Execution Stayed per Stipulation/Order, Earliest Execution Date 12/21/2019; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part J; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Appear; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable David Alan Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, Issuance Stayed 5 days thru 10/26/2019, No Execution Stay, Earliest Execution Date 10/27/2019; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less