This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 09/22/2020 at 21:12:55 (UTC).

Richardson, Donnell T vs. Cummings, Alejandrina

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 Richardson, Donnell T filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Cummings, Alejandrina. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/LO

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Donnell T Richardson

Respondent

Alejandrina Cummings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert Theodore Koryl

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/17/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Control Date; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2020

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Extend Time

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2019

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, No Stay/Issuance Forthwith, No Execution Stay, Earliest Execution Date 09/27/2019; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less