This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/24/2022 at 17:31:40 (UTC).

Price, David vs. Dexter, David G

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Price, David filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Dexter, David G. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1/LO

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Claimant

David Price

Defendant

David G Dexter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/08/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Dismissed; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less