This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/15/2022 at 19:51:10 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. Riford, Joanne

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Riford, Joanne. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Luke A. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1/NT

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Luke A. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Joanne Riford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Christa L. Muratore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/05/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable Luke A. Brown Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Luke A. Brown Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Purpose: Conference: Preliminary; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Control Date; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less