This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/25/2022 at 18:04:05 (UTC).

O'Donnell, Diane vs. ResCOM G.C., Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 O'Donnell, Diane filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ResCOM G C , Inc. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1/LO

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Claimant

Diane O'Donnell

Defendant

ResCOM G.C., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

Charles P Ben

Defendant Attorney

Dipasquale & Carney, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Calendared in Error (no Control Date set); Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:45 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Calendared in Error (no Control Date set); Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less