This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 17:29:22 (UTC).

Linden Plaza Preservation L.P. vs. Ramos, Melitza "Doe", "John" "Doe", "Jane"

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 Linden Plaza Preservation L P filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Ramos, Melitza Doe , John Doe , Jane. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable David Alan Harris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable David Alan Harris

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Linden Plaza Preservation L.P.

Respondents

"John" "Doe"

"Jane" "Doe"

Melitza Ramos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, P.C.

Attorney at Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, P.C.

813 Jericho Turnpike

New Hyde Park, NY 11040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Eleanora Ofshtein Part C; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Denied - No Appearance Movant; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas Michael Fitzpatrick Part C; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Eleanora Ofshtein

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Denied - No Appearance Movant Before Judge: Honorable Thomas Michael Fitzpatrick

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, No Stay/Issuance Forthwith, Execution Stayed per Stipulation/Order, Earliest Execution Date 12/21/2019; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part C; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Entry of Judgment of Possession and/or Money Judgment and Issuance of a Warrant; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Settled Stip in File; Judge Part: Honorable Eleanora Ofshtein Part C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less