This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 09/03/2022 at 23:54:59 (UTC).

LaSalle Contracting Corp vs. Packard, Karen Packard, Karen vs. Niagara Mechanical Contracting, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 LaSalle Contracting Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Packard, Karen Packard, Karen. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Katherine D. Alexander. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********1/NT

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Katherine D. Alexander

 

Party Details

Claimants and Defendants

LaSalle Contracting Corp

Karen Packard

3Rd Party Defendant

Niagara Mechanical Contracting, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Camille Brown

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/03/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Dismissed; Judge Part: Honorable Luke A. Brown Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Luke A. Brown Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Luke A. Brown Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less