This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 10/13/2020 at 21:04:43 (UTC).

Laon Acupuncture, PC d/b/a 280 Broadway Acupuncture, AAO Robert Anderson vs. State Farm Mutual Auto. Ins. Co.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Laon Acupuncture, PC d/b/a 280 Broadway Acupuncture, AAO Robert Anderson filed an Other lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Richmond County Civil Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/RI

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond County Civil Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laon Acupuncture, PC d/b/a 280 Broadway Acupuncture

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Auto. Ins. Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sanders Barshay Grossman, LLC

Attorney at Sanders Barshay Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Rossillo & Licata, P.C.

Attorney at Rossillo & Licata, P.C.

The Roslic Building

Westbury, NY 11590

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: No Justice Recorded Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Sharon A. Bourne-Clarke Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Judgment - Summary

    Read MoreRead Less