This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 09:02:10 (UTC).

koros, Adam vs. Kaufman, Jesse S. "Doe", "John" "Doe", "Jane"

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 koros, Adam filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Kaufman, Jesse S Doe , John Doe , Jane. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable David Alan Harris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable David Alan Harris

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Adam koros

Respondents

Jesse S. Kaufman

"John" "Doe"

"Jane" "Doe"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Goldberg, Lustig & Steckler, PLLC

Attorney at Goldberg, Lustig & Steckler, PLLC

188 Montague Street, Suite 188

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Respondent Attorney

Wagner , Berkow & Brandt LLP

Attorney at Wagner , Berkow & Brandt LLP

462 & 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable David Alan Harris Part C; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas Michael Fitzpatrick Part C; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas Michael Fitzpatrick Part C; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Amend Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Eleanora Ofshtein Part C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Eleanora Ofshtein Part C; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Eleanora Ofshtein Part C; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Deny

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Eleanora Ofshtein Part C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less