This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 12:16:51 (UTC).

KDF 349 Monroe LLC vs. Singh, Roy "Doe", "John" "Doe", "Jane"

Case Summary

On 07/18/2019 KDF 349 Monroe LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Singh, Roy Doe , John Doe , Jane. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KDF 349 Monroe LLC

Respondents

"John" "Doe"

Roy Singh

"Jane" "Doe"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert Neil Mizrahi

160 Broadway Suite 1010

New York, NY 10038

Respondent Attorney

CAMBA Legal Services, Inc.

Attorney at CAMBA Legal Services, Inc.

885 Flatbush Avenue, Room 202

Brooklyn, NY 11226

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Judge Part: Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski Part O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Heela D. Capell Part O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski Part O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted; Judge Part: Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski Part O; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski Part O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Guardian Ad Litem; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted Before Judge: Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski Part O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski Part O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Jeannine B. Kuzniewski Part O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Inquest: Court; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Hannah Cohen Part F - UA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial Ready: Bench; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Cheryl J. Gonzales Part EX - Expediter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Inquest: Court; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Hannah Cohen Part F - UA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Hannah Cohen Part F - UA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Michael L. Weisberg Part F - UA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less