This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 12/29/2020 at 21:38:44 (UTC).

Jaidyn Realty HDFC vs. Hale, Tammy

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Jaidyn Realty HDFC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Hale, Tammy. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Bronx County Civil Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable David J. Bryan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/BX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable David J. Bryan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jaidyn Realty HDFC

Respondent

Tammy Hale

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rosenblum & Bianco, LLP

Attorney at Rosenblum & Bianco, LLP

100 Merrick Rd, Suite 306 East

Rockville Centre, NY 11570-4800

Respondent Attorney

Mobilization for Justice by Javeria Hashmi

Attorney at Mobilization for Justice by Javeria Hashmi

424 East 147Th St

Bronx, NY 10455

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 12:30 PM; Purpose: Disposition; Outcome Type: Settled Stip in File; Judge Part: Honorable David J. Bryan Part L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 12:30 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable David J. Bryan Part L; Motion Seq: 007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable David J. Bryan Part L; Motion Seq: 007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Christel Fleur Garland Housing Motion Part; Motion Seq: 007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 007; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: For Permission; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable David J. Bryan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable David J. Bryan Part L; Motion Seq: 006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 006; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable David J. Bryan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 005; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: OSC Denied - No Calendar Date Before Judge: Honorable Norma J. Jennings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Enedina Pilar Sanchez Part L; Motion Seq: 004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Enedina Pilar Sanchez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: OSC Denied - No Calendar Date Before Judge: Honorable Norma J. Jennings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Norma J. Jennings Part L; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Norma J. Jennings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted to Extent per Order; Judge Part: Honorable Christel Fleur Garland Part G; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Christel Fleur Garland Part G; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted to Extent per Order Before Judge: Honorable Christel Fleur Garland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, Execution Stayed thru 06/30/2019; Judge Part: Honorable Christel Fleur Garland Part G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Christel Fleur Garland Part G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Christel Fleur Garland Part G

    Read MoreRead Less