This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 12/29/2020 at 19:53:31 (UTC).

Harvey Family Chiro PT & Acup PLLC, as assignee of Noel Kenton vs. Travelers Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 Harvey Family Chiro PT Acup PLLC, as assignee of Noel Kenton filed an Other lawsuit against Travelers Insurance Company. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Bronx County Civil Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********7/BX

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harvey Family Chiro PT & Acup PLLC

Defendant

Travelers Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Chris McCollum PC

Attorney at Law Offices of Chris McCollum PC

1100 Coney Island Ave Suite 211

Brooklyn, NY 11226

Defendant Attorney

ALOY IBUZOR

485 Lexington Ave., 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10017-2600

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Judge Part: No Justice Recorded Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:35 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Emily Morales-Minerva Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted to Extent per Order; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted to Extent per Order; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: Judgment - Summary; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted to Extent per Order Before Judge: Honorable Myrna Socorro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Brenda Rivera Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Lyle E. Frank Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kim A. Wilson Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Withdrawn; Judge Part: Honorable Kim A. Wilson Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Marian Doherty Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Denise M Dominguez Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Armando Montano Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Denise M Dominguez Part 40 - Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Judgment - Summary; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted to Extent per Order Before Judge: Honorable Myrna Socorro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: Strike; Nature of Decision/Judge: Withdrawn Before Judge: Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less