This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 11/03/2020 at 23:12:37 (UTC).

Gruszewski, Michael vs. Domingiuz, Jennifer

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Gruszewski, Michael filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Domingiuz, Jennifer. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0/LO

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael Gruszewski

Respondent

Jennifer Domingiuz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Paul T. Buerger Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/05/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less