This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 07/21/2022 at 17:58:44 (UTC).

G.J. Llyod Enterprises Inc. vs. Joel Tucciarone, The Plumber

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 G J Llyod Enterprises Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Joel Tucciarone, The Plumber. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2/LO

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Claimant

G.J. Llyod Enterprises Inc.

Defendant

Joel Tucciarone, The Plumber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

Kevin Vasquez Hutcheson Esq.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/18/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:15 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less