This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 01:19:56 (UTC).

Gian, Richelle M vs. Davis, Diana

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Gian, Richelle M filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Davis, Diana. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2/LO

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Richelle M Gian

Respondent

Diana Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Scott R. Stopa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/17/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, No Stay/Issuance Forthwith, No Execution Stay, Earliest Execution Date 06/01/2022; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:45 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:45 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:45 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:45 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 03:15 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less