This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 07/21/2022 at 17:23:13 (UTC).

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC vs. Fuller, Joan

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Fuller, Joan. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2/LO

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

Defendant

Joan Fuller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darryl N McPherson

Rausch Sturm

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/30/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 11:00 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Denied; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil; Motion Seq: 001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2022

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment; Nature of Decision/Judge: Denied Before Judge: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Refer to Judge; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less