This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 09/22/2020 at 21:58:26 (UTC).

Edin, Larry Edin, Janet vs. Deskovic, Dave

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Edin, Larry Edin, Janet filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Deskovic, Dave. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Katherine D. Alexander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0/NT

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Katherine D. Alexander

 

Party Details

Claimants

Janet Edin

Larry Edin

Defendant

Dave Deskovic

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Chariles F. Pitarresi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less