This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 12/29/2020 at 20:11:46 (UTC).

Diego Beekman Mutual Housing Association Housing Defelopment Fund Corp vs. Torres, Iris "Doe", "John" "Doe", "Jane"

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 Diego Beekman Mutual Housing Association Housing Defelopment Fund Corp filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Torres, Iris Doe , John Doe , Jane. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Bronx County Civil Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Brenda S. Spears. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********7/BX

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Brenda S. Spears

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Diego Beekman Mutual Housing Association Housing Defelopment Fund Corp

Respondents

Iris Torres

"John" "Doe"

"Jane" "Doe"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hertz, Cherson & Rosenthal, PC

Attorney at Hertz, Cherson & Rosenthal, PC

118-35 Queens Blvd, 9Th Floor

Forest Hills, NY 11375

Respondent Attorney

The Legal Aid Society (Bronx)

Attorney at The Legal Aid Society (Bronx)

260 East 161St Street, 8Th Floor

Bronx, NY 10451

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Brenda S. Spears Part M; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Brenda S. Spears Part M; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Brenda S. Spears Part M; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Brenda S. Spears Part M; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: For Permission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Settled Stip in File; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Arlene H. Hahn Part M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kimon C. Thermos Part M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Steven Weissman Part M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Steven Weissman Part M

    Read MoreRead Less