This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 10/06/2020 at 21:33:43 (UTC).

Dellavalle, Anthony vs. Doyle, Daniel Perfetti, Nicole

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Dellavalle, Anthony filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Doyle, Daniel Perfetti, Nicole. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0/LO

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Claimant

Anthony Dellavalle

Defendants

Daniel Doyle

Nicole Perfetti

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/05/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less