This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 04/21/2020 at 23:45:13 (UTC).

CB CSH 2015 LLC vs. Alston, Jerome "Doe", "John" "Doe", "Jane" Lee, Najah

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 CB CSH 2015 LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Alston, Jerome Doe , John Doe , Jane Lee, Najah. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Civil Court located in Putnam, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Kimberley Slade. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/KI

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Kimberley Slade

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CB CSH 2015 LLC

Respondents

Najah Lee

"Jane" "Doe"

"John" "Doe"

Jerome Alston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, P.C.

Attorney at Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, P.C.

813 Jericho Turnpike

New Hyde Park, NY 11040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Kimberley Slade Part G; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kimberley Slade Part G; Motion Seq: 004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G; Motion Seq: 003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Denied; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G; Motion Seq: 002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: Denied Before Judge: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G; Motion Seq: 001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment - Failure to Appear; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, No Stay/Issuance Forthwith, Execution Stayed per Stipulation/Order, Earliest Execution Date 11/16/2019; Judge Part: Honorable Kevin C. McClanahan Part G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less