This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 07/04/2023 at 13:55:43 (UTC).

Trinkwalder, Paul vs. Yu, Feng Cui, Xing

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Trinkwalder, Paul filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Yu, Feng Cui, Xing. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0/NT

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Claimant

Paul Trinkwalder

Defendants

Feng Yu

Xing Cui

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

Dominic H. Saraceno

Defendant Attorney

Mary C. Chan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/07/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Withdrawn; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Reserved Decision; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less