This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/10/2019 at 16:46:21 (UTC).

Painters Plus Home Decorating, Inc. vs. Shanor, Stephen M.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Painters Plus Home Decorating, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Shanor, Stephen M. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/LO

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Painters Plus Home Decorating, Inc.

Defendant

Stephen M. Shanor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas D. D'Angelo

Defendant Attorney

Christopher W. McMaster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2019

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil; Motion Seq: 005

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2019

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 005; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: Vacate Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2018

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Judgment - Summary; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted Before Judge: Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2018

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Strike Complaint; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted Before Judge: Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2018

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Plaintiff; Relief Sought: Withdrawal as Attorney of Record; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted Before Judge: Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2017

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Compel; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted Before Judge: Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less