This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 12/24/2019 at 12:04:58 (UTC).

Yelin, Nikolay vs. Realty USA Laratonda, Kimberly

Case Summary

On 03/23/2016 Yelin, Nikolay filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Realty USA Laratonda, Kimberly. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********6/NT

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson

 

Party Details

Claimant

Nikolay Yelin

Defendants

Kimberly Laratonda

Realty USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

Valeriya Nitko

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Albert

William F. Keenan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/21/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Reserved Decision; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2016

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Small Claims

[+] Read More [-] Read Less