This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 07/04/2023 at 12:42:06 (UTC).

DeAngeli, Ronald vs. Mike Basil Toyota

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 DeAngeli, Ronald filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mike Basil Toyota. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0/LO

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Claimant

Ronald DeAngeli

Defendant

Mike Basil Toyota

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Robert D Steinhaus

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/28/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Reserved Decision; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Rescheduled; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2021

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2020

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Hearing; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less