This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 12/24/2019 at 13:32:29 (UTC).

Jackson, Jill vs. Szweczyk, Christine

Case Summary

On 11/16/2016 Jackson, Jill filed an Other lawsuit against Szweczyk, Christine. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Katherine D. Alexander. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********6/NT

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Katherine D. Alexander

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jill Jackson

Defendant

Christine Szweczyk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark Andrew Doane

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/22/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Dismissed; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Conference: Status; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Status; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less