This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 08/28/2019 at 14:31:18 (UTC).

YWCA of the Niagara Frontier Inc vs. Firland Management LLC

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 YWCA of the Niagara Frontier Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Firland Management LLC. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********8/LO

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YWCA of the Niagara Frontier Inc

Defendant

Firland Management LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles P Ben

Defendant Attorney

Abraham J Platt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/07/2019

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Settled; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2019

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2019

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Removed from Calendar (no Control Date set); Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less