This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 12/23/2019 at 12:43:17 (UTC).

Hurtubise, Victoria Forsaith, Audrey City of North Tonawanda vs. Mercado, Dina M

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 Hurtubise, Victoria Forsaith, Audrey City of North Tonawanda filed an Other lawsuit against Mercado, Dina M. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********7/NT

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Audrey Forsaith

Victoria Hurtubise

City of North Tonawanda

Defendant

Dina M Mercado

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Matt A. Albert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/02/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Decision for All Plaintiffs Against All Defendants; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Shawn P. Nickerson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less