This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 10/20/2020 at 22:46:41 (UTC).

Campo Family, LLC, By: Mary Bingoli, member vs. Reyes, Jose Nelson Santos, Anaisa Santos, Brian "Doe", "John"

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Campo Family, LLC, By Mary Bingoli, member filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Reyes, Jose Nelson Santos, Anaisa Santos, Brian Doe , John. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Richmond County Civil Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Remy Smith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********9/RI

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond County Civil Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Remy Smith

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Campo Family, LLC

Respondents

"John" "Doe"

Brian Santos

Jose Nelson Reyes

Anaisa Santos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Duskin & Crowe

Attorney at Duskin & Crowe

1688 Victory Boulevard 2Nd Floor

Staten Island, NY 10314-3533

Respondent Attorney

Staten Island Legal Services

Attorney at Staten Island Legal Services

36 Richmond Terrace, Suite 205

Staten Island, NY 10301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:15 AM; Purpose: Motion; Judge Part: Honorable Remy Smith Part Y; Motion Seq: 005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 005; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Enforce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 004; Filed By: Petitioner; Relief Sought: Enforce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 003; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Extension of Time to Comply with Stip; Nature of Decision/Judge: OSC Denied - No Calendar Date Before Judge: Honorable Remy Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted to Extent per Order; Judge Part: Honorable Kimberley Slade Part Y; Motion Seq: 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 002; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Stay Eviction; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted to Extent per Order Before Judge: Honorable Kimberley Slade

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted on Consent; Judge Part: Honorable Kimberley Slade Part Y; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Respondent; Relief Sought: Stay Eviction; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted on Consent Before Judge: Honorable Kimberley Slade; Decision Date: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Inquest: Court; Outcome Type: Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, Execution Stayed per Stipulation/Order; Judge Part: Honorable Kimberley Slade Part Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned Judgment with Possession, with Warrant, Execution Stayed per Stipulation/Order; Judge Part: Honorable Kimberley Slade Part Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: For All Purposes; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kimberley Slade Part Y

    Read MoreRead Less