This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 07/28/2022 at 18:20:43 (UTC).

Buffalo Synapse Support, LLC vs. Kloss, Caren

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Buffalo Synapse Support, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Kloss, Caren. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Lockport City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********2/LO

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buffalo Synapse Support, LLC

Defendant

Caren Kloss

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Michael Aloi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:00 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable William J. Watson Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Conference; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Thomas M. DiMillo Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Dismiss Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less