This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 12/23/2019 at 12:44:43 (UTC).

Bud Bakewell Bruins Hockey Association, Inc. vs. Stine, William

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 Bud Bakewell Bruins Hockey Association, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Stine, William. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, North Tonawanda City Court located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Katherine D. Alexander. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********7/NT

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Katherine D. Alexander

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bud Bakewell Bruins Hockey Association, Inc.

Defendant

William Stine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Michael Ratajczak

Defendant Attorney

Raymond Thomas Burgasser

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/27/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Settled Stip in File; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2018

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2017

DocketAppearance Information: Time: 01:30 PM; Purpose: Conference: Pretrial; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Katherine D. Alexander Civil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less