This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 12/29/2020 at 20:01:35 (UTC).

Alexander Baldonado Medical P.C., AAO Charlotte White vs. Nationwide General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 Alexander Baldonado Medical P C , AAO Charlotte White filed an Other lawsuit against Nationwide General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Bronx County Civil Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********7/BX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexander Baldonado Medical P.C.

Defendant

Nationwide General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Blinder Esq.

2478 Mcdonald Ave

Brooklyn, NY 11223

Defendant Attorney

Hollander Legal Group, PC

Attorney at Hollander Legal Group, PC

105 Maxess Road

Melville, NY 11747

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Judge Part: No Justice Recorded Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Clerk's Office Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Fidel E. Gomez Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 10:30 AM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Granted - Index Disposed; Judge Part: Honorable Naita A. Semaj Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Naita A. Semaj Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Naita A. Semaj Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kim A. Wilson Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Naita A. Semaj Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:00 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Kim A. Wilson Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:30 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Myrna Socorro Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 02:15 PM; Purpose: Motion; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Fidel E. Gomez Part 41 - Non-Procedural Motions No Fault; Motion Seq: 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketMotion Information: Motion Number: 001; Filed By: Defendant; Relief Sought: Judgment - Summary; Nature of Decision/Judge: Granted - Index Disposed Before Judge: Honorable Naita A. Semaj

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketAppearance Information: Time: 09:35 AM; Purpose: Trial: Bench; Outcome Type: Adjourned; Judge Part: Honorable Lyle E. Frank Part 15 N - Non-Jury No Fault

    Read MoreRead Less